TX HB1776 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of an elective course on the founding principles of the United States in the curriculum for public high school students and the posting of the founding documents of the United States in public school buildings.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of an elective course on the founding principles of the United States in the curriculum for public high school students and the posting of the founding documents of the United States in public school buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1776 |
2021-05-10 | House | Postponed 5/10/21 3:25 PM |
2021-05-10 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-03 | House | Postponed 5/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1776 (Same As) 2021-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers