TX HB1763 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the contractual relationship between a pharmacist or pharmacy and a health benefit plan issuer or pharmacy benefit manager.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the contractual relationship between a pharmacist or pharmacy and a health benefit plan issuer or pharmacy benefit manager.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#453 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-13HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenatePassed
2021-05-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-05-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Gutierrez
2021-05-13SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-12SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-03SenateRead first time
2021-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#453
2021-04-27HousePassed
2021-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-26HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-26HouseAmended 1-Lucio
2021-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-10HouseRead first time
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB528 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Left pending in committee
HB1670 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Insurance

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1763
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01763I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01763H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01763E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01763S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01763F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01763H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01763S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01763I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01763H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01763E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01763E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1763&RcdVtNo=453&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-13-F.PDF#page=32

Bill Comments 750

feedback