TX HB1757 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of an insured to select a pharmacist under the insured's health insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of an insured to select a pharmacist under the insured's health insurance policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#514
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-18HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-18HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2049 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback