TX HB1755 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to assembled vehicles and former military vehicles, including the titling and registration of those vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to assembled vehicles and former military vehicles, including the titling and registration of those vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1852 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Amended RV#293 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 183
2019-05-24HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 183
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1852
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#293
2019-04-11HousePassed as amended
2019-04-11HouseAmended 1-Canales
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-10HouseAmended 1-E. Thompson
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1462 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback