TX HB1754 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disclosure of certain prescription drug information by a health benefit plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disclosure of certain prescription drug information by a health benefit plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2023-05-09HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 622
2023-05-08HousePostponed 5/9/23 10:00 AM
2023-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-07HouseReferred to Insurance
2023-03-07HouseRead first time
2023-01-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB622 (Same As) 2023-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB622 (Same As) 2023-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/23

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback