TX HB1752 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to benefit review conferences under the Texas workers' compensation system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to benefit review conferences under the Texas workers' compensation system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#540 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#540
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-03-10HouseRead first time
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback