TX HB1750 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of force or deadly force in defense of a person.
Title
Relating to the use of force or deadly force in defense of a person.
Sponsors
Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
Rep. David Cook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |