TX HB1739 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the rights of victims, guardians of victims, and close relatives of deceased victims in the criminal justice system.
Title
Relating to the rights of victims, guardians of victims, and close relatives of deceased victims in the criminal justice system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |