TX HB1735 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to election officers and practices; increasing a criminal penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to election officers and practices; increasing a criminal penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1845 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#539 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-23SenateLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-23SenatePostponed
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmendment amended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-04-27HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2017-04-27HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Elections
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-02-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback