TX HB1711 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of digital license plates; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of digital license plates; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#617 (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateAmended
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Paxton
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-04-25SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#617
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-23HouseAmended 1-Paddie
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2076 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback