TX HB1709 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for the dissolution of the Bois D'Arc Island Levee Improvement District of Dallas and Kaufman Counties.
Title
Relating to procedures for the dissolution of the Bois D'Arc Island Levee Improvement District of Dallas and Kaufman Counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Lance Gooden [R] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-30 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOIS D'ARC ISLAND LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTICT
DALLAS COUNTY
KAUFMAN COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
DALLAS COUNTY
KAUFMAN COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility