TX HB1695 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training for governmental entities and vendors, including purchasing and contract management training; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to training for governmental entities and vendors, including purchasing and contract management training; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1695 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01695I.htm |