TX HB1692 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-4)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transportation or storage of a handgun or other firearm or ammunition by a license holder in a motor vehicle in a parking area of a primary or secondary school.
Title
Relating to the transportation or storage of a handgun or other firearm or ammunition by a license holder in a motor vehicle in a parking area of a primary or secondary school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Weapons
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Weapons