TX HB1683 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating oil and gas operations within the State of Texas.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating oil and gas operations within the State of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#954 (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#954 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Zwiener |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1734 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development