TX HB1680 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of on-site sewage disposal systems on certain leased land that is owned by the federal government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of on-site sewage disposal systems on certain leased land that is owned by the federal government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-04-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#132
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-03-31HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-22HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB665 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1680
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01680I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01680H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01680E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01680S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01680I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01680H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01680H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01680E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01680E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1680&RcdVtNo=132&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback