TX HB1678 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Governor's Committee on People with Disabilities.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Governor's Committee on People with Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - HB 1678Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-12 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-08 | House | Amended |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
GOVERNOR'S COMMITTEE ON PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Human Services
Human Services--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
GOVERNOR'S COMMITTEE ON PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Human Services
Human Services--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills