TX HB1670 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the contractual relationship between a pharmacist or pharmacy and a health benefit plan issuer or pharmacy benefit manager.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the contractual relationship between a pharmacist or pharmacy and a health benefit plan issuer or pharmacy benefit manager.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB528 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Left pending in committee
HB1763 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback