TX HB1669 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing and improving the mental health and substance use disorder workforce in this state and increasing the capacity of local mental health authorities to provide access to mental health services in certain counties.
Title
Relating to increasing and improving the mental health and substance use disorder workforce in this state and increasing the capacity of local mental health authorities to provide access to mental health services in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#614 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#561 (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#614 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#561 (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Returned from the House for further action |
2019-05-24 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2019-05-24 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#614 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#561 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB429 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
RURAL
STATEWIDE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH COORDINATING COUNCIL
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
RURAL
STATEWIDE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH COORDINATING COUNCIL