TX HB1656 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain orders, proclamations, and regulations issued in response to a disaster by the governor or the presiding officer of the governing body of a political subdivision.
Title
Relating to certain orders, proclamations, and regulations issued in response to a disaster by the governor or the presiding officer of the governing body of a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Governor
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Governor