TX HB1655 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-21)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to restrictions on the age of persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to restrictions on the age of persons employed by or allowed on the premises of a sexually oriented business; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2021-04-09HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2021-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2021-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in s/c
2021-04-09HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2021-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB315 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback