TX HB1655 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reporting of certain offenses committed by members of the Texas military forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reporting of certain offenses committed by members of the Texas military forces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#529 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-16HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-16SenateRecord vote
2017-05-16SenatePassed
2017-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-16SenateRecord vote
2017-05-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-02-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback