TX HB1653 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disannexation of certain areas that do not receive full municipal services.
Title
Relating to disannexation of certain areas that do not receive full municipal services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 659 |
2021-05-05 | House | Postponed 5/6/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-03 | House | Postponed 5/5/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-27 | House | Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB659 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b)