TX HB1652 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain direct sales of food to consumers and a limitation on the fee amount for certain permits.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain direct sales of food to consumers and a limitation on the fee amount for certain permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB617 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Agriculture
FARMERS' MARKETS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FOOD
Health
Health--General
FARMERS' MARKETS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FOOD
Health
Health--General