TX HB1651 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the care of pregnant women confined in county jail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the care of pregnant women confined in county jail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1696 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1696
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#199
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-08HouseAmended 1-Toth
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback