TX HB1650 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of plumbing, including the requirements to obtain a tradesman plumber-limited license.
Title
Relating to the regulation of plumbing, including the requirements to obtain a tradesman plumber-limited license.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
Rep. Jeff Cason [R] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. John Frullo [R] |
Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. John Smithee [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] |
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF