TX HB1649 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transportation and storage of firearms and ammunition in private vehicles on the campuses of institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the transportation and storage of firearms and ammunition in private vehicles on the campuses of institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |