TX HB1640 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to ensuring continuity of education for homeless children and foster care youth and access to higher education, career information, and skills certification for foster care youth and former foster care youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ensuring continuity of education for homeless children and foster care youth and access to higher education, career information, and skills certification for foster care youth and former foster care youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-22SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-05HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-02-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback