TX HB1635 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for early childhood intervention services.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for early childhood intervention services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1183 (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1183 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Miller |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1956 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety