TX HB1635 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to request a state innovation waiver for certain small group health benefit plans of certain federal actuarial value and level of coverage requirements.
Title
Relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to request a state innovation waiver for certain small group health benefit plans of certain federal actuarial value and level of coverage requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. John Smithee [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-09 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-04-25 | House | Postponed |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1635 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01635I.htm |