TX HB1633 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the audiology and speech-language pathology interstate compact; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1126 (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1126 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1497 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
AUDIOLOGISTS
AUDIOLOGY AND SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGY COMPACT COMMISSION
Electronic Information Systems
Intergovernmental Relations
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS
AUDIOLOGY AND SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGY COMPACT COMMISSION
Electronic Information Systems
Intergovernmental Relations
Military & Veterans
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS