TX HB1630 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the funding of dual credit courses provided by public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the funding of dual credit courses provided by public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback