TX HB1622 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the alcoholic beverage licenses and permits that may be issued in an area that has approved the sale of mixed beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the alcoholic beverage licenses and permits that may be issued in an area that has approved the sale of mixed beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-01HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2013-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-22HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-04HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2013-03-04HouseRead first time
2013-02-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback