TX HB1622 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting of early voting rosters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting of early voting rosters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#311 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#289 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-11HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-11HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-10SenateRecord vote
2021-05-10SenatePassed
2021-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-10SenateRecord vote
2021-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#311
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#289
2021-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1622
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01622I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01622H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01622E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01622S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01622F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01622I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01622H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01622H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01622E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01622E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1622&RcdVtNo=289&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1622&RcdVtNo=311&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=32

Bill Comments 750

feedback