TX HB1615 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB700 (Same As) 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills