TX HB1613 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of recovery community organization services under Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of recovery community organization services under Medicaid.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1807 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback