TX HB1600 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the review date for certain governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.
Title
Relating to the review date for certain governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#189 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 2nd time RV#181 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 2nd time RV#181 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#189 |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-13 | House | Record vote RV#181 |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
ANATOMICAL BOARD, STATE OF TEXAS
ANIMAL HEALTH COMMISSION, TEXAS
BRAZOS RIVER AUTHORITY
CREDIT UNION COMMISSION
CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
FIRE PROTECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HOLOCAUST & GENOCIDE COMMISSION, TEXAS
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
PREPAID HIGHER EDUCATION TUITION BOARD
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE-FEDERAL RELATIONS, OFFICE OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset—Required Reviews
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
ANATOMICAL BOARD, STATE OF TEXAS
ANIMAL HEALTH COMMISSION, TEXAS
BRAZOS RIVER AUTHORITY
CREDIT UNION COMMISSION
CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
FIRE PROTECTION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HOLOCAUST & GENOCIDE COMMISSION, TEXAS
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
PREPAID HIGHER EDUCATION TUITION BOARD
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE-FEDERAL RELATIONS, OFFICE OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset—Required Reviews
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF