TX HB16 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 87-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 87-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of the rights of a living unborn child after an abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of the rights of a living unborn child after an abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1727 (Y: 84 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#493 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 49 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#437 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 50 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#493 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 49 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#437 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 50 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1727 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 RodrÃguez |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#493 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#437 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB23 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence