TX HB1592 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health care professional liability coverage for certain public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care professional liability coverage for certain public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-14HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-14HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#243
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-09HouseAmended 1-Clardy
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB919 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback