TX HB1590 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to statewide policies and practices, personnel training, evidence collection and preservation, and data collection and analysis regarding the prevention, investigation, and prosecution of sexual assault and other sex offenses.
Title
Relating to statewide policies and practices, personnel training, evidence collection and preservation, and data collection and analysis regarding the prevention, investigation, and prosecution of sexual assault and other sex offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1735 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1050 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1050 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1735 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1050 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Howard |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2384 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Governor
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL ASSAULT SURVIVOR ASSISTANCE, OFFICE FOR
SEXUAL ASSAULT SURVIVORS' TASK FORCE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Governor
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL ASSAULT SURVIVOR ASSISTANCE, OFFICE FOR
SEXUAL ASSAULT SURVIVORS' TASK FORCE