TX HB1590 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to statewide policies and practices, personnel training, evidence collection and preservation, and data collection and analysis regarding the prevention, investigation, and prosecution of sexual assault and other sex offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to statewide policies and practices, personnel training, evidence collection and preservation, and data collection and analysis regarding the prevention, investigation, and prosecution of sexual assault and other sex offenses.

Sponsors

Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. John Turner [D]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Kirk Watson [D]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1735 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1050 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04 Effective immediately
2019-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1735
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1050
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmended 1-Howard
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2384 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback