TX HB1587 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use by insurance companies of separate accounts in connection with life insurance and annuities and certain other benefits.
Title
Relating to the use by insurance companies of separate accounts in connection with life insurance and annuities and certain other benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#681 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-11 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1734 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1734 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1734 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce