TX HB1586 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the services that require a structural pest control license; changing the applicability of an occupational license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the services that require a structural pest control license; changing the applicability of an occupational license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#774 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-18HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-02-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback