TX HB1585 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to including student input before the adoption of a major curriculum initiative by a school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to including student input before the adoption of a major curriculum initiative by a school district.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback