TX HB1574 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to documentation regarding an arrest of a person without a warrant.
Title
Relating to documentation regarding an arrest of a person without a warrant.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Wilson [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] |
Rep. Scott Cosper [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Amended RV#1091 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Record vote RV#1042 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - RV#1041 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Record vote RV#1042 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - RV#1041 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |