TX HB1567 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the presentation of a statement by certain persons at the conclusion of a juvenile disposition hearing.
Title
Relating to the presentation of a statement by certain persons at the conclusion of a juvenile disposition hearing.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice