TX HB1563 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of animal export-import processing facilities; providing penalties; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of animal export-import processing facilities; providing penalties; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1056 (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amended RV#1026 (Y: 110 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amended RV#1026 (Y: 110 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1056 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1026 |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 2-Stucky |
2019-05-06 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Stucky |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Nevárez |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Animals
IMPORTS & EXPORTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Animals
IMPORTS & EXPORTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions