TX HB1563 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas State Technical College System to offer technical-vocational courses or programs.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas State Technical College System to offer technical-vocational courses or programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1563 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01563I.htm |