TX HB1562 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice provided when a bail bond surety is in default.
Title
Relating to notice provided when a bail bond surety is in default.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-04 - House - HB 1562Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BAIL BONDSMEN
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General