TX HB1561 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to entrance examinations for applicants for beginning positions in fire and police departments in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to entrance examinations for applicants for beginning positions in fire and police departments in certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback