TX HB1561 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing a waiver of certain state park fees for certain children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing a waiver of certain state park fees for certain children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback